Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4433 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodriguez H.B. No. 4433
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4433By: Seliger By: Seliger
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009;
 May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 25, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 12, Nays 0; May 25, 2009,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption from oil and gas severance taxes for oil
 and gas produced in association with the production of geothermal
 energy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 201, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 201.060 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.060.  EXEMPTION OF GAS INCIDENTALLY PRODUCED IN
 ASSOCIATION WITH THE PRODUCTION OF GEOTHERMAL ENERGY.  Gas
 incidentally produced in association with the production of
 geothermal energy is not subject to the tax imposed by this chapter.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 202, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 202.063 to read as follows:
 Sec. 202.063.  EXEMPTION OF OIL INCIDENTALLY PRODUCED IN
 ASSOCIATION WITH THE PRODUCTION OF GEOTHERMAL ENERGY.  Oil
 incidentally produced in association with the production of
 geothermal energy is not subject to the tax imposed by this chapter.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *