Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4435 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Allen (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 4435
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4435 By: West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement for participation by certain principals
 in the school leadership pilot program for principals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 11.203(d), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d) A principal who was employed as a principal at a campus
 that was [of a campus] rated academically unacceptable during the
 preceding school year [, as well as any person employed to replace
 that principal,] shall participate in the program and complete the
 program requirements not later than a date determined by the
 commissioner.
 SECTION 2. Section 11.203(d), Education Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to a principal employed at a school that is
 rated academically unacceptable during the 2008-2009 school year.
 SECTION 3. It is the intent of the legislature that the
 passage of H.B. No. 3, Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2009, with any amendments to Section 11.203(d), Education
 Code, and the amendments made by this Act shall be harmonized, if
 possible, as provided by Section 311.025(b), Government Code, so
 that effect may be given to each. If amendments made to Section
 11.203(d), Education Code, by H.B. No. 3, Acts of the 81st
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, and the amendments to Section
 11.203(d), Education Code, made by this Act are irreconcilable, it
 is the intent of the legislature that H.B. No. 3, Acts of the 81st
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, prevail, regardless of the
 relative dates of enactment of this Act and H.B. No. 3, Acts of the
 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, but only to the extent
 that any differences are irreconcilable.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *