Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4436 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Smith of Tarrant H.B. No. 4436


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the period during which a judicial candidate or
 officeholder may accept political contributions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 253.153, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a) A judicial candidate or officeholder, a
 specific-purpose committee for supporting or opposing a judicial
 candidate, or a specific-purpose committee for assisting a judicial
 officeholder may not knowingly accept a political contribution
 except during the period:
 (1) beginning on:
 (A) the 210th day before the date an application
 for a place on the ballot or for nomination by convention for the
 office is required to be filed, if the election is for a full term;
 or
 (B) the later of the 210th day before the date an
 application for a place on the ballot or for nomination by
 convention for the office is required to be filed or the date a
 vacancy in the office occurs, if the election is for an unexpired
 term; and
 (2) ending on the 120th day after the date of:
 (A) the [general] election in which the candidate
 or officeholder last appeared on the ballot, regardless of whether
 the candidate or officeholder has an opponent in that election [for
 state and county officers, if the candidate or officeholder has an
 opponent in the general election;
 [(B)     except as provided by Subsection (c), the
 runoff primary election, if the candidate or officeholder is a
 candidate in the runoff primary election and does not have an
 opponent in the general election; or
 [(C)     except as provided by Subsection (c), the
 general primary election, if the candidate or officeholder is not a
 candidate in the runoff primary election and does not have an
 opponent in the general election].
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a judicial candidate
 or officeholder who had an opponent in a primary election or runoff
 primary election but who was not opposed in the general election
 held on November 4, 2008, may accept political contributions as
 provided by this title during the period beginning September 1,
 2009, and ending December 31, 2009. This subsection expires
 January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 2. Section 253.153(c), Election Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.