Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4465 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gallego, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 4465
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 18, 2009, reported
 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 18, 2009, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to "Welcome to Texas" signs on highways entering Texas and
 to the placement of Texas flags at international ports-of-entry.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 201.617, Transportation Code, as added
 by Chapter 474 (H.B. 137), Acts of the 79th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2005, is repealed.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter O, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 201.979 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.979.  "WELCOME TO TEXAS" SIGNS.  (a)  The
 department shall erect a "Welcome to Texas" sign to designate the
 state boundary on an interstate, United States, or state highway
 entering the state.
 (b)  A "Welcome to Texas" sign erected by the department must
 include the following elements:
 (1) a depiction of the state flag; and
 (2) the phrase "Drive Friendly - The Texas Way."
 (c)  A "Welcome to Texas" sign may also include the phrase
 "Welcome to Texas - Proud Home of Presidents Lyndon B. Johnson,
 George H.W. Bush, and George W. Bush."
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c) above, if the president
 of the United States is a resident of Texas, a "Welcome to Texas"
 sign erected by the department shall include the phrase "Welcome to
 Texas - Proud Home of President [insert name of the president of the
 United States]."
 SECTION 3. Subchapter O, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 201.980 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.980.  TEXAS FLAGS AT INTERNATIONAL PORTS-OF-ENTRY.
 (a)  The department shall erect and maintain a Texas flag to
 designate the state boundary at an appropriate location at or near
 each interstate, United States, or state highway originating at an
 official port-of-entry along an international border.
 (b)  A Texas flag flown under this section shall be visible
 from the international port-of-entry and must be equal in size or
 larger than the flag of any foreign nation flown at the
 port-of-entry operating on the other side of the international
 border.
 (c)  The department may contract with any governmental or
 private entity for the care and maintenance of any Texas flag flown
 under this section.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2010.
 * * * * *