Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4493 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Eiland (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 4493
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009;
 May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 18, 2009, reported
 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 18, 2009, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to contracts awarded through competitive bidding by
 certain port and harbor facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 54.054(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) Except as otherwise provided by this chapter, the board
 may award a contract involving the expenditure of funds in excess of
 the amount applicable to an expenditure of funds by a municipality
 under Section 252.021(a), Local Government Code, [more than
 $25,000] only by competitive bidding.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *