Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4498 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hamilton (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 4498
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to ballot issues for a local option election to prohibit
 the sale of alcoholic beverages.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 501.035(c), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c) In an area where the sale of any type or classification
 of [all] alcoholic beverages [including mixed beverages] has been
 legalized, the ballot for a prohibitory election shall be prepared
 to permit voting for or against the one of the following issues that
 applies:
 (1) "The legal sale of beer for off-premise
 consumption only."
 (2) "The legal sale of beer."
 (3) "The legal sale of beer and wine for off-premise
 consumption only."
 (4) "The legal sale of beer and wine."
 (5) "The legal sale of all alcoholic beverages for
 off-premise consumption only."
 (6) "The legal sale of all alcoholic beverages except
 mixed beverages."
 (7) "The legal sale of all alcoholic beverages
 including mixed beverages."
 (8) "The legal sale of mixed beverages."
 (9) "The legal sale of mixed beverages in restaurants
 by food and beverage certificate holders only."
 (10) "The legal sale of wine on the premises of a
 holder of a winery permit."
 SECTION 2. Sections 501.035(d), (e), and (f), Election
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *