Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4545 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Raymond (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 4545
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2009;
 May 8, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 22, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4545 By: Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the time for filing a petition for judicial review in
 certain workers' compensation cases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 410.252(a), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a) A party may seek judicial review by filing suit not
 later than the 45th [40th] day after the date on which [the decision
 of the appeals panel was filed with] the division mailed the party
 the decision of the appeals panel. For purposes of this section,
 the mailing date is considered to be the fifth day after the date
 the decision of the appeals panel was filed with the division.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a judicial review proceeding initiated under Subchapter F or G,
 Chapter 410, Labor Code, on or after the effective date of this Act.
 A proceeding initiated before that date is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the proceeding was initiated, and the former law
 is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *