Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4550 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 3, 2009      TO: Honorable Patrick M. Rose, Chair, House Committee on Human Services      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB4550 by Naishtat (Relating to the recruitment and retention of certain caseworkers employed by the Department of Family and Protective Services.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would require the Department of Family and Protective Services to use special assessment tools in screening applicants for employment with the division. It would require the agency to study the salaries of each type of child protective services caseworker to determine the role salary plays in recruitment, retention, and turnover, and to report the results of the study by December 1, 2010. It would also require the Health and Human Services Commission to consider contracting with an institution of higher education to perform the study. Provisions relating to the salary study would expire on September 1, 2011. The bill would be effective immediately if it receives a two-thirds vote, or on September 1, 2009. Although the agency indicates there would be some cost to implement the provisions of the bill, it is assumed that these costs can be absorbed within existing resources. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 710 Texas A&M University System Administrative and General Offices, 720 The University of Texas System Administration   LBB Staff:  JOB, CL, NM, MB    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 3, 2009





  TO: Honorable Patrick M. Rose, Chair, House Committee on Human Services      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB4550 by Naishtat (Relating to the recruitment and retention of certain caseworkers employed by the Department of Family and Protective Services.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Patrick M. Rose, Chair, House Committee on Human Services
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB4550 by Naishtat (Relating to the recruitment and retention of certain caseworkers employed by the Department of Family and Protective Services.), As Introduced

 Honorable Patrick M. Rose, Chair, House Committee on Human Services 

 Honorable Patrick M. Rose, Chair, House Committee on Human Services 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB4550 by Naishtat (Relating to the recruitment and retention of certain caseworkers employed by the Department of Family and Protective Services.), As Introduced

HB4550 by Naishtat (Relating to the recruitment and retention of certain caseworkers employed by the Department of Family and Protective Services.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would require the Department of Family and Protective Services to use special assessment tools in screening applicants for employment with the division. It would require the agency to study the salaries of each type of child protective services caseworker to determine the role salary plays in recruitment, retention, and turnover, and to report the results of the study by December 1, 2010. It would also require the Health and Human Services Commission to consider contracting with an institution of higher education to perform the study. Provisions relating to the salary study would expire on September 1, 2011. The bill would be effective immediately if it receives a two-thirds vote, or on September 1, 2009. Although the agency indicates there would be some cost to implement the provisions of the bill, it is assumed that these costs can be absorbed within existing resources.

The bill would require the Department of Family and Protective Services to use special assessment tools in screening applicants for employment with the division. It would require the agency to study the salaries of each type of child protective services caseworker to determine the role salary plays in recruitment, retention, and turnover, and to report the results of the study by December 1, 2010. It would also require the Health and Human Services Commission to consider contracting with an institution of higher education to perform the study. Provisions relating to the salary study would expire on September 1, 2011. The bill would be effective immediately if it receives a two-thirds vote, or on September 1, 2009. Although the agency indicates there would be some cost to implement the provisions of the bill, it is assumed that these costs can be absorbed within existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 710 Texas A&M University System Administrative and General Offices, 720 The University of Texas System Administration

530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 710 Texas A&M University System Administrative and General Offices, 720 The University of Texas System Administration

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, NM, MB

 JOB, CL, NM, MB