Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4607 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 4607
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 International Relations and Trade; May 14, 2009, reported
 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 14, 2009, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to regulation of certain areas bordering on Falcon Lake
 and the Rio Grande River.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 231.252, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 231.252. AREAS SUBJECT TO REGULATION. This
 subchapter applies only to the unincorporated area of counties
 exercising the powers of a Type A municipality [Zapata County]
 located within 25,000 feet of:
 (1) the project boundary line for Falcon Lake; [and]
 (2) the Rio Grande River; and
 (3)  tributaries and arroyos leading to Falcon Lake or
 to the Rio Grande River.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *