Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4611 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Oliveira, Otto (Senate Sponsor - Williams) H.B. No. 4611
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 12,
 Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the treatment of proceeds from sales of certain loans
 and securities for purposes of apportionment under the franchise
 tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 171.106, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (f-1) to read as follows:
 (f-1)  Notwithstanding Section 171.1055, if a lending
 institution categorizes a loan or security as "Securities Available
 for Sale" or "Trading Securities" under Financial Accounting
 Standard No. 115, the gross proceeds of the sale of that loan or
 security are considered gross receipts. In this subsection,
 "Financial Accounting Standard No. 115" means the Financial
 Accounting Standard No. 115 in effect as of January 1, 2009, not
 including any changes made after that date. In this subsection,
 "security" means a security as defined in Section 171.0001(13-a).
 SECTION 2. This Act applies only to a report originally due
 on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect January 1, 2010.
 * * * * *