Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4631 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R12333 JTS-D
 By: Lucio III H.B. No. 4631


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to procedures required for the continued annexation of
 certain areas annexed by certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter Z, Chapter 43, Local Government Code,
 is amended by adding Section 43.909 to read as follows:
 Sec. 43.909.  REQUIRED INCLUSION OF AREAS IN ANNEXATION PLAN
 OF CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES. (a) In this section, "strip annexation
 area" means an area annexed by a municipality the width of which at
 its widest point is less than 1,001 feet.
 (b)  A municipality located in a county with an international
 border that has annexed more than 10 miles of strip annexation area
 shall include in its annexation plan each area located in its
 extraterritorial jurisdiction by virtue of the area being adjacent
 to a strip annexation area that was annexed after January 1, 2002,
 and before January 1, 2003.
 (c)  The annexation of an area under Subsection (b) must be
 completed before the 31st day after the third anniversary of the
 date the area was included in the annexation plan. If the
 annexation is not completed within the period prescribed by this
 subsection, the municipality shall give its written consent to
 release the area from the municipality's extraterritorial
 jurisdiction by ordinance or resolution as provided by Section
 42.023.
 SECTION 2. On or before January 1, 2010, a municipality
 described by Section 43.909, Local Government Code, as added by
 this Act, shall amend its annexation plan to include territory as
 provided by Section 43.909, Local Government Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.