Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB464 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Paxton, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 464
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 18, 2009;
 May 19, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 25, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 10,
 Nays 1; May 25, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the preparation by the Legislative Budget Board of a
 dynamic fiscal impact statement for certain bills and joint
 resolutions affecting taxes and fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 314, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 314.005 to read as follows:
 Sec. 314.005.  DYNAMIC FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT ON TAX OR FEE
 MEASURE.  (a)  The board shall prepare a dynamic fiscal impact
 statement for each bill or joint resolution:
 (1)  that raises or lowers the rate or amount of a tax
 or fee or proposes an amendment to the Texas Constitution that would
 raise or lower the rate or amount of a tax or fee; and
 (2)  for which a fiscal note is prepared indicating a
 positive or negative impact on revenue of at least $100 million
 during a period not to exceed five years.
 (b)  The dynamic fiscal impact statement must, based on
 dynamic scoring principles, project for the five-year period
 beginning on the proposed effective date of the change in the rate
 or amount of the tax or fee the estimated fiscal and economic
 impacts of raising or lowering the rate or amount of the tax or fee
 as proposed, including the impact on:
 (1) tax or fee receipts; and
 (2)  the costs of the specific program, if any, that the
 tax or fee is designed to directly support.
 (c)  In this section, "dynamic scoring principles" means a
 method of estimating the pace of economic growth or the change in
 the aggregate level of economic output and incomes, in response to a
 change in the rate or amount of a tax or fee, that takes into
 consideration factors including:
 (1)  the direct impact on tax or fee receipts and, if
 the tax or fee is designed to directly support a specific program,
 on program costs;
 (2)  the effects on incentives to work, save, invest,
 and conduct economic affairs;
 (3)  the resulting change in the overall level of
 economic activity;
 (4)  the impact of the resulting higher or lower level
 of economic activity on tax or fee receipts and, if the tax or fee is
 designed to directly support a specific program, on program costs;
 and
 (5)  a calculation of the net impact of the legislation
 proposing the change on the unified budget.
 (d)  The dynamic fiscal impact statement must be attached to
 the bill or resolution immediately following the fiscal note
 attached under Section 314.003.
 (e)  On the fifth anniversary of the effective date of a bill
 that becomes law for which a dynamic fiscal impact statement was
 prepared under this section, the comptroller shall prepare and
 submit to the presiding officer of each house of the legislature a
 report that assesses the accuracy of the relevant fiscal note
 prepared for the bill and the accuracy of the relevant dynamic
 fiscal impact statement prepared for the bill.
 SECTION 2. Section 314.004(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c) The impact statement must be attached to the bill or
 resolution immediately following:
 (1) the fiscal note attached under Section 314.003; or
 (2)  if a dynamic fiscal impact statement is prepared
 under Section 314.005, the dynamic fiscal impact statement.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *