Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4642 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio III, Oliveira, Raymond H.B. No. 4642
 (Senate Sponsor - Lucio)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 14, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; May 14, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4642 By: Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Rep. Jim Solis and Colonel H. William "Bill" Card,
 Jr. Outpatient Clinic.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 13, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 13.007 to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.007.  REP. JIM SOLIS AND COLONEL H. WILLIAM "BILL"
 CARD, JR. OUTPATIENT CLINIC. The outpatient clinic operated by the
 South Texas Health Care System in Harlingen, Texas, is named the
 Rep. Jim Solis and Colonel H. William "Bill" Card, Jr. Outpatient
 Clinic in honor of Rep. Jim Solis and Colonel H. William "Bill"
 Card, Jr.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *