Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4661 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Brown of Brazos (Senate Sponsor - Ogden) H.B. No. 4661
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2009;
 May 7, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 15, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; May 15, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the rate of the municipal hotel occupancy tax in certain
 municipalities and to the use of certain revenue from the tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 351, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 351.0035 to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.0035.  TAX RATE AND USE IN CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES.
 (a) The tax imposed by this chapter in a home-rule municipality
 that was originally chartered in or after 1938, that is home to a
 major state university, and that is located in a county bordered by
 the Brazos and Navasota Rivers, may be imposed at any rate not to
 exceed 7.75 percent of the price paid for a room in a hotel.
 (b)  The municipality shall allocate for the construction of
 a convention center in the municipality all revenue received by the
 municipality that is derived from the application of the tax at a
 rate of more than seven percent of the price paid for a room in a
 hotel.
 (c)  The municipality may not increase the rate of the tax to
 a rate above seven percent before the date the municipality
 executes a contract for the construction of the convention center.
 (d)  This section expires on the date the governing body of
 the municipality certifies that all debt relating to the convention
 center payable from the tax, including interest and any costs
 relating to the debt, has been paid in full or a deposit has been
 made and an escrow agreement in relation to the debt has been
 executed.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *