Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB471 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hilderbran (Senate Sponsor - Duncan) H.B. No. 471
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 11, 2009, reported
 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 11, 2009, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a segment of State Highway 158 in
 Runnels County as the Army Specialist William Justin Byler Memorial
 Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.078 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.078.  ARMY SPECIALIST WILLIAM JUSTIN BYLER MEMORIAL
 HIGHWAY. (a) State Highway 158 in Runnels County, between Farm
 Road 2887 and Ranch Road 2111, is designated as the Army Specialist
 William Justin Byler Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall
 design and construct memorial markers indicating the highway
 number, the designation as the Army Specialist William Justin Byler
 Memorial Highway, and any other appropriate information. The
 department shall erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *