By: Homer, Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 4767 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009; May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Government Organization; May 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4767 By: Hegar A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the designation of days, weeks, and months for recognition by concurrent resolution of the legislature. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. The heading to Chapter 391, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: CHAPTER 391. RESOLUTIONS FOR STATE SYMBOLS, [AND] PLACE DESIGNATIONS, AND RECOGNITION DAYS, WEEKS, AND MONTHS SECTION 2. Section 391.001, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 391.001. EFFECT OF CHAPTER. (a) This chapter governs the designation of state symbols, [and] place designations, and days, weeks, and months for recognition made by the legislature by resolution approved by each house of the legislature. (b) This chapter does not affect the designation of: (1) a state symbol or a place designation made by: (A) [(1)] resolution before September 1, 2001; or (B) [(2)] statute; or (2) a day, week, or month for recognition made by: (A) resolution before September 1, 2009; or (B) statute. SECTION 3. Chapter 391, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 391.004 to read as follows: Sec. 391.004. DESIGNATING DAYS, WEEKS, OR MONTHS FOR RECOGNITION. (a) In this section, "date designation" means the special observance authorized by the legislature that annually recognizes and honors a culturally or historically significant day, week, or month in the state. (b) The legislature may assign more than one designation to a day, week, or month. (c) Before the legislature may designate a day, week, or month for recognition, the legislature must be presented with information related to the historical or cultural significance of the day, week, or month to be recognized by persons supporting the designation. (d) A designation of a day, week, or month for recognition expires on the 10th anniversary of the date the legislature finally passes the resolution making the designation. This subsection does not prevent the legislature from redesignating a day, week, or month for recognition during or after the 10-year period. SECTION 4. Sections 391.002(c) and 391.003(f), Government Code, are repealed. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *