Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4793 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gonzales, Martinez, Pea H.B. No. 4793
 (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 18, 2009;
 May 19, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of two additional county courts at law in
 Hidalgo County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 25.1101(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a) Hidalgo County has the following statutory county
 courts:
 (1) County Court at Law No. 1 of Hidalgo County;
 (2) County Court at Law No. 2 of Hidalgo County;
 (3) County Court at Law No. 4 of Hidalgo County;
 (4) County Court at Law No. 5 of Hidalgo County; [and]
 (5) County Court at Law No. 6 of Hidalgo County;
 (6) County Court at Law No. 7 of Hidalgo County; and
 (7) County Court at Law No. 8 of Hidalgo County.
 SECTION 2. (a) The County Court at Law No. 7 of Hidalgo
 County is created on the effective date of this Act.
 (b) Notwithstanding Section 25.1101(a)(7), Government
 Code, as added by this Act, the County Court at Law No. 8 of Hidalgo
 County is created on September 1, 2012.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *