Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB488 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bohac, Anchia, Sheffield H.B. No. 488
 (Senate Sponsor - Duncan)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 12, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 12, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility requirements for volunteer deputy
 registrars.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 13.031(d), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d) To be eligible for appointment as a volunteer deputy
 registrar, a person must:
 (1) be 18 years of age or older; and
 (2)  not have been finally convicted of a felony or, if
 so convicted, must have:
 (A)  fully discharged the person's sentence,
 including any term of incarceration, parole, or supervision, or
 completed a period of probation ordered by any court; or
 (B)  been pardoned or otherwise released from the
 resulting disability to vote.
 SECTION 2. Section 13.032, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 13.032. PROHIBITION ON REFUSING TO APPOINT. A
 registrar may not refuse to appoint as a volunteer deputy
 registrar:
 (1) a person eligible for appointment under Section
 13.031(d) [resident of the county served by the registrar]; or
 (2) any person on the basis of sex, race, creed, color,
 or national origin or ancestry.
 SECTION 3. The appointment of a person serving as a
 volunteer deputy registrar who does not meet the eligibility
 requirements of Section 13.031(d), Election Code, as amended by
 this Act, expires on the effective date of this Act. The secretary
 of state shall prescribe procedures necessary to implement this
 section.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *