Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB498 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: McClendon, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 498
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 18, 2009;
 May 21, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0,
 1 present not voting; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 498 By: Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a commission to investigate and prevent
 wrongful convictions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 43, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 43.27 to read as follows:
 Art. 43.27. TIMOTHY COLE INNOCENCE COMMISSION
 Sec. 1.  CREATION. The Timothy Cole Innocence Commission is
 created.
 Sec. 2.  COMPOSITION. (a) The commission is composed of the
 following nine members:
 (1)  two members appointed by the governor, one of whom
 must be a prosecuting attorney and one of whom must be a law
 enforcement officer;
 (2)  one member appointed by the chair of the criminal
 justice committee of the senate, who may be a member of the
 legislature;
 (3)  one member appointed by the chair of the criminal
 jurisprudence committee of the house of representatives, who may be
 a member of the legislature;
 (4)  one member appointed by the presiding judge of the
 court of criminal appeals, who must be a member of the judiciary;
 (5)  one member appointed by the presiding officer of
 the Texas Forensic Science Commission, who must work in the
 forensic science field;
 (6)  one member who is appointed, on a rotating basis,
 by the executive director of the innocence project at the Texas Tech
 University School of Law, the president of the Texas Center for
 Actual Innocence at The University of Texas School of Law, or the
 director of the Texas innocence network at the University of
 Houston Law Center and who must be an attorney with experience in
 filing successful appellate claims based on actual innocence;
 (7)  one member appointed by the Texas Criminal Defense
 Lawyers Association, who must be a criminal defense lawyer; and
 (8)  the director of the Task Force on Indigent
 Defense.
 (b) Each member serves a two-year term.
 (c)  The governor shall designate a member to serve as
 presiding officer.
 Sec. 3.  DUTIES. The commission shall investigate
 thoroughly all post-conviction exonerations in this state,
 including, in appropriate circumstances as determined by the
 commission, convictions vacated based on a plea to time served, to:
 (1)  ascertain errors and defects in the criminal
 procedure used to prosecute the defendant's case at issue;
 (2)  identify errors and defects in the criminal
 justice process in this state generally;
 (3)  develop solutions and methods to correct the
 identified errors and defects; and
 (4)  identify procedures and programs to prevent future
 wrongful convictions.
 Sec. 4.  REPORT. (a) The commission shall compile a
 detailed annual report of its findings and recommendations,
 including any proposed legislation to implement procedures and
 programs to prevent future wrongful convictions.
 (b)  The report shall be made available to the public on
 request.
 Sec. 5.  SUBMISSION. The commission shall submit the report
 described by Section 4 to the governor, the lieutenant governor,
 and the speaker of the house of representatives not later than
 December 1 of each even-numbered year.
 Sec. 6.  RESPONSE. Not later than the 60th day after the
 date of receipt of the report required by this article, the
 governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of
 representatives shall, singly or jointly, issue a formal written
 response to the findings and recommendations of the commission.
 Sec. 7.  REIMBURSEMENT. A member of the commission is not
 entitled to compensation but is entitled to reimbursement for the
 member's travel expenses as provided by Chapter 660, Government
 Code, and the General Appropriations Act.
 Sec. 8.  ASSISTANCE. The Texas Legislative Council and the
 Legislative Budget Board shall assist the commission in performing
 the commission's duties.
 Sec. 9.  OTHER LAW. The commission is not subject to Chapter
 2110, Government Code.
 SECTION 2. (a) The purpose of this section is to establish
 the rotating basis for appointments as required by Section 2,
 Article 43.27, Code of Criminal Procedure, as added by this Act.
 (b) The executive director of the innocence project at the
 Texas Tech University School of Law shall make the first
 appointment under Section 2, Article 43.27, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, as added by this Act. On the expiration of the term of
 that appointee, the president of the Texas Center for Actual
 Innocence at The University of Texas School of Law shall make the
 second appointment under Section 2, Article 43.27, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, as added by this Act. On the expiration of the term of
 that appointee, the director of the Texas innocence network at the
 University of Houston Law Center shall make the third appointment.
 On the expiration of the term of that appointee, the appointment
 cycle described by this section begins again.
 SECTION 3. The initial appointments to the Timothy Cole
 Innocence Commission as required by Article 43.27, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, as added by this Act, shall be made not later than
 November 1, 2009.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *