Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB530 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R3562 GCB-D
 By: Anchia, Lucio III, Alvarado, Weber, H.B. No. 530
 Menendez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to law enforcement training relating to the trafficking of
 persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1701.258 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.258.  EDUCATION AND TRAINING PROGRAMS ON
 TRAFFICKING OF PERSONS. (a) The commission by rule shall require an
 officer first licensed by the commission on or after January 1,
 2011, to complete within a reasonable time after obtaining the
 license a one-time basic education and training program on the
 trafficking of persons. The program must:
 (1) consist of at least four hours of training; and
 (2)  include a review of the substance of Sections
 20A.02 and 43.05, Penal Code.
 (b)  The commission shall make available to each officer a
 voluntary advanced education, instruction, and training program on
 the trafficking of persons, sex trafficking, and compelling
 prostitution prohibited under Sections 20A.02 and 43.05, Penal
 Code.
 (c)  Not later than January 1, 2011, the commission shall
 begin offering the basic and advanced programs established under
 this section. This subsection expires September 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2010, the Commission
 on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and Education shall adopt the
 rules necessary to implement Section 1701.258, Occupations Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.