Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB559 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hernandez, Pena (Senate Sponsor - Gallegos) H.B. No. 559
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2009;
 April 24, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 6, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the nondisclosure of certain personal information in
 voter registration records, concealed handgun license records, and
 tax appraisal records that relates to a justice of the peace.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 13.0021(a)(2), Election Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (2) "State judge" means:
 (A) a judge, former judge, or retired judge of an
 appellate court, a district court, or a county court at law of this
 state; [or]
 (B) an associate judge appointed under Chapter
 201, Family Code, or a retired associate judge or former associate
 judge appointed under that chapter; or
 (C) a justice of the peace.
 SECTION 2. Section 411.171(4-b), Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (4-b) "State judge" means:
 (A) the judge of an appellate court, a district
 court, or a county court at law of this state; [or]
 (B) an associate judge appointed under Chapter
 201, Family Code; or
 (C) a justice of the peace.
 SECTION 3. Section 25.025(a), Tax Code, as amended by
 Chapters 594 (H.B. 41), 621 (H.B. 455), and 851 (H.B. 1141), Acts of
 the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is reenacted and
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) This section applies only to:
 (1) a current or former peace officer as defined by
 Article 2.12, Code of Criminal Procedure;
 (2) a county jailer as defined by Section 1701.001,
 Occupations Code;
 (3) an employee of the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice;
 (4) a commissioned security officer as defined by
 Section 1702.002, Occupations Code;
 (5) a victim of family violence as defined by Section
 71.004, Family Code, if as a result of the act of family violence
 against the victim, the actor is convicted of a felony or a Class A
 misdemeanor; [and]
 (6) a federal judge or state judge;
 (7) [(6)] a current or former employee of a district
 attorney, criminal district attorney, or county or municipal
 attorney whose jurisdiction includes any criminal law or child
 protective services matters; and
 (8) [(6)] an officer or employee of a community
 supervision and corrections department established under Chapter
 76, Government Code, who performs a duty described by Section
 76.004(b) of that code.
 SECTION 4. Section 25.025(a-1)(2), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (2) "State judge" means:
 (A) a judge, former judge, or retired judge of an
 appellate court, a district court, or a county court at law of this
 state; [or]
 (B) an associate judge appointed under Chapter
 201, Family Code, or a retired associate judge or former associate
 judge appointed under that chapter; or
 (C) a justice of the peace.
 SECTION 5. To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
 over another Act of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *