Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB586 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Naishtat (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 586
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 18, 2009;
 May 19, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 22, 2009, reported
 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2009, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the evidence required for the release of a motor vehicle
 after impoundment of the vehicle for failure to maintain evidence
 of financial responsibility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 601.262(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c) The evidence of financial responsibility must cover the
 two-year period immediately following the date the defendant
 applies for release of the impounded vehicle. The court, by order,
 shall permit a defendant to provide evidence of insurability in
 increments of a period of not less than six months.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *