Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB641 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 30, 2009      TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB641 by Zerwas (Relating to the abolition of the Texas Transportation Commission and the creation of a commissioner of transportation as an elected statutory state officer.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB641, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 30, 2009





  TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB641 by Zerwas (Relating to the abolition of the Texas Transportation Commission and the creation of a commissioner of transportation as an elected statutory state officer.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB641 by Zerwas (Relating to the abolition of the Texas Transportation Commission and the creation of a commissioner of transportation as an elected statutory state officer.), As Introduced

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation 

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB641 by Zerwas (Relating to the abolition of the Texas Transportation Commission and the creation of a commissioner of transportation as an elected statutory state officer.), As Introduced

HB641 by Zerwas (Relating to the abolition of the Texas Transportation Commission and the creation of a commissioner of transportation as an elected statutory state officer.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB641, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB641, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 $0   2011 $0   2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0    


2010 $0
2011 $0
2012 $0
2013 $0
2014 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromState Highway Fund6  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2009   2010 $420,862 0.0   2011 $420,862 (5.0)   2012 $637,371 (5.0)   2013 $637,371 (5.0)   2014 $637,371 (5.0)   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromState Highway Fund6  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2009   2010 $420,862 0.0   2011 $420,862 (5.0)   2012 $637,371 (5.0)   2013 $637,371 (5.0)   2014 $637,371 (5.0)  


2010 $420,862 0.0
2011 $420,862 (5.0)
2012 $637,371 (5.0)
2013 $637,371 (5.0)
2014 $637,371 (5.0)

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Transportation Code to eliminate the five-member Texas Transportation Commission and replace the commission and the Executive Director of the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) with a single elected Commissioner of Transportation. The first Commissioner of Transportation would be elected at the general election held in November 2010, to serve a four-year term that would begin on January 1, 2011. The five-member commission and the Executive Director serving on the effective date of the bill would continue service until that time.  The bill would take effect on September 1, 2009.

The bill would amend the Transportation Code to eliminate the five-member Texas Transportation Commission and replace the commission and the Executive Director of the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) with a single elected Commissioner of Transportation. The first Commissioner of Transportation would be elected at the general election held in November 2010, to serve a four-year term that would begin on January 1, 2011. The five-member commission and the Executive Director serving on the effective date of the bill would continue service until that time.

 

Methodology

Based on the analysis and information provided by Sunset Advisory Commission staff on similar legislation, it is assumed the elimination of the five-member transportation commission (effective January 1, 2011) would result in a cost savings to the State Highway Fund of $420,862 in fiscal year 2011 and $637,671 each year thereafter from the elimination of salaries for five commissioners and five assistants (5 full-time-equivalent [FTE] positions) and the associated travel, operating, and employee benefits costs. It is assumed the salary costs for the full-time, new elected Commissioner of Transportation would be accommodated within existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 307 Secretary of State, 601 Department of Transportation

307 Secretary of State, 601 Department of Transportation

LBB Staff: JOB, KJG, MW, TG

 JOB, KJG, MW, TG