Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB651 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Darby (Senate Sponsor - Harris) H.B. No. 651
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2009;
 April 15, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 4, 2009, reported favorably by the
 following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 4, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to compensation of certain persons by a domestic insurance
 company.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 841.252(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a) Unless first authorized by a vote of a domestic
 insurance company's board of directors or a committee of the board
 that has the duty to authorize the payments, the company may not pay
 any compensation or emolument in an amount that, when added to any
 compensation or emolument paid to the person by an affiliated
 domestic insurance company, exceeds $150,000 [$100,000] in any year
 to an individual, firm, or corporation, including an officer or
 director of the company.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *