Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB655 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Solomons (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 655
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to payment to a trustee or substitute trustee after public
 sale of foreclosed property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 51.0075(f), Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (f) The purchase price in a sale held by a trustee or
 substitute trustee under this section is due and payable without
 delay [immediately] on acceptance of the bid or within such
 reasonable time as may be agreed upon by the purchaser and the
 trustee or substitute trustee if the purchaser makes such request
 for additional time to deliver the purchase price [by the trustee or
 substitute trustee]. The trustee or substitute trustee shall
 disburse the proceeds of the sale as provided by law.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *