Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB671 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Darby, et al. H.B. No. 671
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 671By: Seliger By: Seliger
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the penalty for theft from a nonprofit organization or
 by Medicare providers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (f), Section 31.03, Penal Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (f) An offense described for purposes of punishment by
 Subsections (e)(1)-(6) is increased to the next higher category of
 offense if it is shown on the trial of the offense that:
 (1) the actor was a public servant at the time of the
 offense and the property appropriated came into the actor's
 custody, possession, or control by virtue of his status as a public
 servant;
 (2) the actor was in a contractual relationship with
 government at the time of the offense and the property appropriated
 came into the actor's custody, possession, or control by virtue of
 the contractual relationship; or
 (3) the owner of the property appropriated was at the
 time of the offense:
 (A) an elderly individual; or
 (B) a nonprofit organization; or
 (4)  the actor was a Medicare provider in a contractual
 relationship with the federal government at the time of the offense
 and the property appropriated came into the actor's custody,
 possession, or control by virtue of the contractual relationship.
 SECTION 2. Section 31.03(h), Penal Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (3) to read as follows:
 (3)  "Nonprofit organization" means an organization
 that is exempt from federal income taxation under Section 501(a),
 Internal Revenue Code of 1986, by being described as an exempt
 organization by Section 501(c)(3) of that code.
 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense was committed before that
 date.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *