By: Bonnen (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 675 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2009; April 27, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; May 8, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 8, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 675 By: Huffman A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a retired status license for an optometrist or therapeutic optometrist practicing voluntary charity care. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 351, Occupations Code, is amended by adding Section 351.265 to read as follows: Sec. 351.265. RETIRED STATUS. (a) The board by rule may allow a license holder to place the person's license on retired status. A license holder must apply to the board for retired status, on a form prescribed by the board, before the expiration date of the person's license. (b) In determining whether to grant retired status, the board shall consider the age, years of practice, and status of the license holder at the time of the application. (c) A license holder on retired status: (1) must pay a license renewal fee in an amount equal to the renewal fee for a license on inactive status; and (2) except as provided by Subsection (f), may not perform any activity regulated under this chapter. (d) To reinstate a license placed on retired status, the license holder must submit a written request for reinstatement to the board. The board may return the license to active status and issue a renewal license if the license holder complies with any education or other requirement established by board rule and pays the renewal fee in effect at the time of the requested reinstatement. (e) The board may charge a reasonable administrative fee to cover the cost of research and the preparation of documentation for the board's consideration of a request for reinstatement of a license on retired status. (f) A license holder on retired status may perform an activity regulated under this chapter if the license holder's practice consists only of voluntary charity care, as defined by board rule. The board's rules under this subsection must prescribe the scope of practice permitted for the license holder, the license holder's authority to prescribe and administer drugs, and any continuing education requirements applicable to the license holder. The scope of practice of a license holder on retired status may not be greater than the scope of practice of the same license holder on active status. SECTION 2. Subchapter G, Chapter 351, Occupations Code, is amended by adding Section 351.3065 to read as follows: Sec. 351.3065. RENEWAL OF EXPIRED LICENSE BY RETIRED OPTOMETRIST OR THERAPEUTIC OPTOMETRIST. The board may renew the license of a person whose license has been expired for one year or more without requiring the person to comply with the requirements and procedures for an original license if the person places the person's renewed license on retired status and confines the person's practice solely to voluntary charity care under Section 351.265(f). SECTION 3. Not later than December 1, 2009, the Texas Optometry Board shall adopt rules necessary to implement the changes in law made by this Act. SECTION 4. (a) Section 351.265, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, applies to an application for retired status filed on or after January 1, 2010. (b) Section 351.3065, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, applies to an application for renewal of an expired license filed on or after January 1, 2010. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *