Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB715 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 715


 AN ACT
 relating to motor vehicle inspection stations that perform
 emissions inspections using only the onboard diagnostic system of
 inspected vehicles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 548, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 548.3075 to read as follows:
 Sec. 548.3075.  LIMITED EMISSIONS INSPECTIONS. (a)  In this
 section, "limited emissions inspection" means an emissions
 inspection of a motor vehicle conducted only by using the onboard
 diagnostic system of the vehicle.
 (b)  A department rule that allows a qualified inspection
 station to perform a limited emissions inspection of a motor
 vehicle may not restrict the station to fewer than 150 inspections
 per month.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect December 31, 2010.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 715 was passed by the House on April
 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 715 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 715 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 715 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays
 4; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 715 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor