Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB764 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hartnett, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Wentworth) H.B. No. 764
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2009;
 May 12, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 21, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 764 By: Wentworth


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility for assignment as a visiting judge.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (t), Section 25.0022, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (t) To be eligible for assignment under this section, a
 former or retired judge of a statutory probate court must:
 (1) not have been removed from office; [and]
 (2) certify under oath to the presiding judge, on a
 form prescribed by the state board of regional judges, that:
 (A)  the judge has never been publicly reprimanded
 or censured by the State Commission on Judicial Conduct; and
 (B) the judge:
 (i) did not resign or retire from office
 after the State Commission on Judicial Conduct notified the judge
 of the commencement of a full investigation into an allegation or
 appearance of misconduct or disability of the judge [having
 received notice that formal proceedings by the State Commission on
 Judicial Conduct had been instituted] as provided in Section 33.022
 and before the final disposition of that investigation; or
 (ii)  if the judge did resign from office
 under circumstances described by Subparagraph (i), was not publicly
 reprimanded or censured as a result of the investigation;
 (3)  annually demonstrate that the judge has completed
 in the past state fiscal year the educational requirements for an
 active statutory probate court judge;
 (4)  have served as an active judge for at least 96
 months in a district, statutory probate, statutory county, or
 appellate court; and
 (5)  have developed substantial experience in the
 judge's area of specialty [the proceedings].
 SECTION 2. (a) The change in law made by this Act by
 amending Subdivision (2), Subsection (t), Section 25.0022,
 Government Code, and by adding Subdivisions (4) and (5), Subsection
 (t), Section 25.0022, Government Code, applies only to an
 assignment of a visiting judge appointed under Chapter 25,
 Government Code, made on or after September 1, 2009. An assignment
 made before September 1, 2009, is governed by Subsection (t),
 Section 25.0022, Government Code, as it exists on the date of the
 assignment, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b) The change in law made by this Act by amending
 Subdivision (2), Subsection (t), Section 25.0022, Government Code,
 and by adding Subdivisions (4) and (5), Subsection (t), Section
 25.0022, Government Code, does not apply to a person who
 immediately before the effective date of this Act meets the
 eligibility requirements to be assigned by the presiding judge
 under Subsection (h), Section 25.0022, Government Code, and the
 former law is continued in effect for determining that person's
 eligibility for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *