Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB768 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kolkhorst (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 768
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 4, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 21, 2009, reported
 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2009, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement that a new road ordered by the
 commissioners court of a county be laid out by a jury of view.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 251.054, Transportation Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *