Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB785 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R3292 UM-D
 By: Rodriguez H.B. No. 785


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to employment services for persons with disabilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 531, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter S to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER S. EMPLOYMENT SERVICES
 Sec. 531.751.  EMPLOYMENT SERVICES. (a) The executive
 commissioner shall ensure that employment services programs,
 including supported employment services programs, are structured
 in a manner that assists persons with disabilities to obtain and
 maintain meaningful employment in integrated settings.
 (b)  The executive commissioner shall adopt rules necessary
 to eliminate barriers to employment services for individuals
 eligible to receive services under a Section 1915(c) waiver
 program, including rules that:
 (1)  expand an individual's time and budget allowances
 for employment services for consumers receiving services under
 Section 1915(c) waiver programs;
 (2)  allow consumers to exercise self-determination
 and choose the amount of money in the consumer's budget that the
 consumer allocates toward employment services;
 (3)  ensure that employment services are available
 under all Section 1915(c) waiver programs;
 (4)  ensure that case managers assist consumers of
 waiver services in developing an individualized budget, selecting
 an approved employment services provider, and creating an
 employment services plan; and
 (5)  ensure that a provider of employment services
 under contract with the Department of Aging and Disability Services
 provides transportation to competitive employment locations.
 Sec. 531.752.  EMPLOYMENT SERVICES PROVIDER MINIMUM
 STANDARDS; REQUIRED APPROVAL. (a) The executive commissioner, the
 Department of Assistive and Rehabilitative Services, and the
 Department of Aging and Disability Services shall collaboratively
 develop minimum standards for employment services providers that
 contract with either agency.
 (b)  The Department of Assistive and Rehabilitative Services
 shall:
 (1)  review and approve applications to provide
 employment services to ensure that all employment services
 providers meet the minimum standards adopted under Subsection (a),
 regardless of:
 (A)  the type or duration of employment services
 provided; or
 (B)  whether the persons receiving the services
 are clients of the Department of Assistive and Rehabilitative
 Services or the Department of Aging and Disability Services;
 (2)   maintain a list of employment services providers
 that meet the minimum standards; and
 (3)  make the list available to a person that requests
 information regarding employment services, regardless of whether
 the person receives services from the department.
 (c)  A person may not provide employment services through a
 contract with the Department of Assistive and Rehabilitative
 Services or the Department of Aging and Disability Services unless
 the person has applied for and been approved as an employment
 services provider by the Department of Assistive and Rehabilitative
 Services.
 (d) The executive commissioner shall ensure that:
 (1)  agreements or contracts are developed as needed to
 allow other health and human services agencies to contract with
 employment services providers approved by the Department of
 Assistive and Rehabilitative Services; and
 (2)  employment services are available under the
 consumer-directed services option.
 Sec. 531.753.  INFORMATION REGARDING SOCIAL SECURITY INCOME
 AND BENEFITS AND FEDERAL WORK INCENTIVE PROGRAMS. (a) The
 executive commissioner shall ensure that each health and human
 services agency has sufficient expertise regarding social security
 income and benefits and federal work incentives to ensure that a
 person with a disability receives accurate and appropriate
 information and referrals related to social security income and
 benefit programs and federal employment services.
 (b)  The Department of Aging and Disability Services shall
 ensure that case managers, including case managers employed by
 employment services providers, have access to and are trained to
 provide information regarding the use of social security, federal
 work incentives, and the Medicaid buy-in program to interested
 consumers. The department shall designate at least one staff
 person in each region to provide the information required by this
 section to consumers and their families.
 (c)  The executive commissioner shall ensure that each local
 mental retardation authority designates an employee to provide the
 information required by this section to consumers and their
 families.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 533, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 533.0371 to read as follows:
 Sec. 533.0371.  PLAN TO REDUCE RELIANCE ON SHELTERED
 WORKSHOPS. (a) The Department of Aging and Disability Services
 shall develop a plan to significantly reduce reliance on sheltered
 workshops as an employment option for people with disabilities.
 The plan must identify all federal funding opportunities that would
 assist the department in reducing reliance on sheltered workshops.
 (b)  The plan developed under Subsection (a) must provide for
 the significant reduction of reliance on sheltered workshops not
 later than September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 3. Section 117.058(a), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) The department shall establish and require employee
 participation in a specialized training program for certain
 employees, including vocational rehabilitation counselors and
 vocational rehabilitation transition specialists and transition
 counselors, whose duties involve assisting youth with disabilities
 to transition to post-schooling activities, services for adults, or
 community living.
 SECTION 4. Subchapter A, Chapter 302, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 302.016 to read as follows:
 Sec. 302.016.  PROVISION OF DISABILITY NAVIGATOR SERVICES.
 (a)  In this section, "disability navigator services" includes
 services that:
 (1) are provided through a one-stop approach; and
 (2)  assist persons with disabilities in navigating a
 variety of programs that have an impact on locating and maintaining
 employment.
 (b)  The commission shall identify and implement funding
 options that will allow the commission to increase the number of
 individuals providing disability navigator services to a level that
 ensures that each local workforce area has access to at least one
 individual who provides disability navigator services.
 SECTION 5. (a) The Health and Human Services Commission
 shall analyze employment services provider payment rates and rate
 methodology and determine the optimum rates and rate methodology
 that will ensure an adequate employment services provider base for
 individuals with disabilities. In conducting the analysis, the
 commission shall consider the use of an outcome-based methodology
 for payment of employment services providers.
 (b) Not later than September 1, 2010, the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall provide a report to the governor,
 lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives
 that contains the results of the analysis performed under this
 section and recommendations for any necessary legislation as
 determined by the commission.
 SECTION 6. (a) A person providing employment services
 through a contract with the Department of Aging and Disability
 Services or the Department of Assistive and Rehabilitative Services
 on September 1, 2009, may continue to provide employment services
 and is not required to apply for employment services provider
 approval under Section 531.752, Government Code, as added by this
 Act, until September 1, 2011.
 (b) Not later than September 1, 2010, the Department of
 Aging and Disability Services shall submit to the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission the plan
 required by Section 533.0371, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act.
 SECTION 7. If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.