Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB802 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Davis of Harris, et al. H.B. No. 802
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 15, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; May 15, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 802 By: Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the lifespan respite services program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 161, Human Resources Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter F to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER F.  LIFESPAN RESPITE SERVICES PROGRAM
 Sec. 161.151. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Chronic serious health condition" means a health
 condition that:
 (A)  requires periodic treatment by a health care
 provider, including a nurse as authorized by Chapter 301,
 Occupations Code, or a physician assistant as authorized by Chapter
 204, Occupations Code; and
 (B)  continues over an extended period, including
 recurring episodes of a single underlying health condition such as
 asthma, diabetes, epilepsy, or multiple sclerosis.
 (2)  "Respite services" means support services,
 including in-home services or adult day-care services, that are
 provided for the purpose of temporarily giving relief to a primary
 caregiver who provides care to an individual with a chronic serious
 health condition or disability.
 (3)  "Respite services coordinator" means a
 community-based organization or local governmental entity with
 which the department enters into a contract to facilitate access to
 respite services under Section 161.154.
 Sec. 161.152.  LIFESPAN RESPITE SERVICES PROGRAM. The
 department shall implement the lifespan respite services program to
 promote the provision of respite services through contracts with
 eligible community-based organizations or local governmental
 entities.
 Sec. 161.153.  ELIGIBILITY.  (a)  A person is eligible to
 participate in the program if the person:
 (1) is the primary caregiver for a person who:
 (A)  is related to the caregiver within the second
 degree of consanguinity or affinity;
 (B)  has a chronic serious health condition or
 disability;
 (C)  requires assistance with one or more
 activities of daily living; and
 (D)  is not eligible for or not able to
 participate in any other existing program that provides respite
 services; and
 (2)  meets criteria specified in rules adopted by the
 executive commissioner.
 (b)  The executive commissioner may not specify criteria
 that limit a person's eligibility based on the type of chronic
 serious health condition or disability of the person receiving
 care.
 Sec. 161.154.  RESPITE SERVICES CONTRACTS. (a)  The
 department shall contract with at least three eligible
 community-based organizations or local governmental entities
 selected by the department to:
 (1) provide respite services; and
 (2) facilitate access to respite services.
 (b)  The department may award a contract under this section
 only after issuing a request for proposals for the contract.
 (c)  A community-based organization or local governmental
 entity is eligible to contract under this section only if the
 organization or entity has experience in and an existing procedure
 for:
 (1)  coordinating support services for multiple groups
 of persons who need support services, including persons with a
 physical or intellectual disability and elderly persons;
 (2)  connecting caregivers with respite services
 providers;
 (3)  maintaining and providing information regarding
 available respite services; and
 (4)  conducting public awareness activities regarding
 available respite services.
 (d)  The department shall include in each contract with a
 respite services coordinator provisions requiring the coordinator
 to:
 (1)  subject to the availability of money, provide
 vouchers for respite services to caregivers participating in the
 program who are not eligible for respite services provided through
 other programs; and
 (2)  connect caregivers participating in the program
 with available respite services.
 (e)  The department shall provide each community-based
 organization or local governmental entity with which the department
 contracts under this subchapter with:
 (1) technical assistance; and
 (2) policy and program development support.
 (f)  The department shall monitor a contractor's performance
 under a contract entered into under this subchapter using clearly
 defined and measurable performance objectives.
 Sec. 161.155.  RESPITE SERVICES COORDINATOR FUNCTIONS. A
 respite services coordinator under contract with the department
 shall:
 (1)  maintain information regarding respite services
 providers;
 (2)  build partnerships with respite services
 providers; and
 (3)  implement public awareness activities regarding
 respite services.
 Sec. 161.156.  RULES. The executive commissioner shall adopt
 rules necessary to implement this subchapter.
 SECTION 2. Not later than November 1, 2010, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission, in
 consultation with the Department of Aging and Disability Services,
 shall submit a report to the governor and the Legislative Budget
 Board regarding the lifespan respite services program established
 under Subchapter F, Chapter 161, Human Resources Code, as added by
 this Act. The report must include an evaluation of the effect of
 the program on:
 (1) access to respite services by primary caregivers
 of persons with chronic serious health conditions or disabilities;
 and
 (2) Medicaid expenditures for long-term care services
 provided in institutional care settings.
 SECTION 3. This Act does not make an appropriation. A
 provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program,
 creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental
 entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the
 legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the
 provision.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *