Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB805 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Quintanilla, Fletcher, Flynn H.B. No. 805
 (Senate Sponsor - Carona)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009;
 May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 23, 2009, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 805 By: Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definitions of police vehicle and authorized
 emergency vehicle for the purposes of certain traffic laws.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Sections 541.201(1) and (13-a), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (1) "Authorized emergency vehicle" means:
 (A) a fire department or police vehicle;
 (B) a public or private ambulance operated by a
 person who has been issued a license by the Texas Department of
 Health;
 (C) a municipal department or public service
 corporation emergency vehicle that has been designated or
 authorized by the governing body of a municipality;
 (D) a private vehicle of a volunteer firefighter
 or a certified emergency medical services employee or volunteer
 when responding to a fire alarm or medical emergency;
 (E) an industrial emergency response vehicle,
 including an industrial ambulance, when responding to an emergency,
 but only if the vehicle is operated in compliance with criteria in
 effect September 1, 1989, and established by the predecessor of the
 Texas Industrial Emergency Services Board of the State Firemen's
 and Fire Marshals' Association of Texas; [or]
 (F) a vehicle of a blood bank or tissue bank,
 accredited or approved under the laws of this state or the United
 States, when making emergency deliveries of blood, drugs,
 medicines, or organs; or
 (G)  a vehicle operated by an employee of a
 district attorney's office, criminal district attorney's office,
 county attorney's office, or medical examiner's office, other than
 a vehicle operated in the manner described by Section 546.001(2) or
 (4), Section 284.070, Section 366.178, or Section 370.177(a) or
 (k), that:
 (i)  is registered to the appropriate office
 and authorized by that office for use in performing the official
 duties of the office; or
 (ii)  is a private vehicle of an employee of
 the appropriate office for which the person has received written
 authority from that office to use the vehicle in performing
 official duties, provided that use of the private vehicle must, if
 applicable, comply with any rule adopted by the commissioners court
 of a county under Section 170.001, Local Government Code.
 (13-a) "Police vehicle" means a vehicle [of a
 governmental entity primarily] used by a peace officer, as defined
 by Article 2.12, Code of Criminal Procedure, for law enforcement
 purposes that:
 (A) is owned or leased by a governmental entity;
 (B)  is owned or leased by the police department
 of a private institution of higher education that commissions peace
 officers under Section 51.212, Education Code; or
 (C) is:
 (i)  a private vehicle owned or leased by the
 peace officer; and
 (ii)  approved for use for law enforcement
 purposes by the head of the law enforcement agency that employs the
 peace officer, or by that person's designee, provided that use of
 the private vehicle must, if applicable, comply with any rule
 adopted by the commissioners court of a county under Section
 170.001, Local Government Code.
 SECTION 2. Section 545.421(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b) A signal under this section that is given by a police
 officer pursuing a vehicle may be by hand, voice, emergency light,
 or siren. The officer giving the signal must be in uniform and
 prominently display the officer's badge of office. The officer's
 vehicle must bear the insignia of a law enforcement agency,
 regardless of whether the vehicle displays an emergency light [be
 appropriately marked as an official police vehicle].
 SECTION 3. Section 284.070, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
 follows:
 (e) An authorized emergency vehicle[, as defined by Section
 541.201,] is exempt from payment of a toll imposed under this
 chapter regardless of whether the vehicle is:
 (1) responding to an emergency;
 (2) displaying a flashing light; or
 (3) marked as an emergency vehicle.
 (f)  In this section, "authorized emergency vehicle" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 541.201.
 SECTION 4. Section 366.178, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (j) to read as
 follows:
 (a) A motor vehicle other than an authorized emergency
 vehicle[, as defined by Section 541.201,] that passes through a
 toll collection facility, whether driven or towed, shall pay the
 proper toll. The exemption from payment of a toll for an
 authorized emergency vehicle applies regardless of whether the
 vehicle is:
 (1) responding to an emergency;
 (2) displaying a flashing light; or
 (3) marked as a police or emergency vehicle.
 (j)  In this section, "authorized emergency vehicle" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 541.201.
 SECTION 5. Sections 370.177(a) and (k), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), the operator of
 a vehicle, other than an authorized emergency vehicle [as defined
 by Section 541.201], that is driven or towed through a toll
 collection facility of a turnpike project shall pay the proper
 toll. The operator of a vehicle who drives or tows a vehicle
 through a toll collection facility and does not pay the proper toll
 commits an offense. An offense under this subsection is a
 misdemeanor punishable by a fine not to exceed $250. The exemption
 from payment of a toll for an authorized emergency vehicle applies
 regardless of whether the vehicle is:
 (1) responding to an emergency;
 (2) displaying a flashing light; or
 (3) marked as an emergency vehicle.
 (k) In this section:
 (1)  "Authorized emergency vehicle" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 541.201.
 (2) "Registered [, "registered] owner" means the owner
 of a vehicle as shown on the vehicle registration records of the
 department or the analogous department or agency of another state
 or country.
 SECTION 6. Section 170.001(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) The commissioners court of a county may adopt rules
 prohibiting or regulating the use of a privately owned motor
 vehicle for the performance of county business or law enforcement
 duties by a sheriff or constable or a deputy or employee of a
 district attorney, criminal district attorney, county attorney,
 medical examiner, sheriff, or constable.
 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *