Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB857 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Laubenberg, Sheffield H.B. No. 857
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 12, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the penalty for certain outdoor burning violations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 7.177, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (b) and (c) and adding Subsection (d) to read
 as follows:
 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (d), an [An] offense
 under this section is punishable for an individual under Section
 7.187(1)(B) or Section 7.187(2)(C) or both.
 (c) Except as provided by Subsection (d), an [An] offense
 under this section is punishable for a person other than an
 individual under Section 7.187(1)(C).
 (d)  An individual who violates a rule adopted under Section
 382.018, Health and Safety Code, by burning waste generated solely
 from property designed for and used exclusively as a private
 residence commits an offense that is:
 (1)  a Class C misdemeanor if the waste is not a
 substance described by Subdivision (3);
 (2)  a Class B misdemeanor if the violation is a second
 or subsequent violation under Subdivision (1) that occurs on the
 same property as a previous violation under that subdivision; and
 (3)  a Class A misdemeanor if the violation involves
 the burning of tires, insulation on electrical wire or cable,
 treated lumber, plastics, non-wood construction or demolition
 materials, heavy oils, asphaltic materials, potentially explosive
 materials, furniture, carpet, chemical wastes, or items containing
 natural or synthetic rubber.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense is committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurs before the effective
 date.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *