Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB871 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Farrar, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Gallegos) H.B. No. 871
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2009;
 May 7, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 25, 2009, reported favorably by
 the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 25, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the method of mailing notice a municipal management
 district may use to notify a property owner about a scheduled
 hearing.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 375.115(c), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c) Written notice containing the information required by
 Subsection (b) shall be mailed by certified mail, return receipt
 requested, or by another method determined by the board to provide
 adequate proof that the notice was timely mailed, not later than the
 30th day before the date of the hearing. The notice shall be mailed
 to each property owner in the district who will be subject to
 assessment at the current address of the property to be assessed as
 reflected on the tax rolls.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *