Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB968 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Homer, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Harris) H.B. No. 968
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 30, 2009;
 April 27, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture and Rural Affairs; May 7, 2009, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4,
 Nays 1; May 7, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 968 By: Estes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of crossbows for hunting.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 43.201(a), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) Except as provided by Subsection (c) or (d), no person
 may hunt deer, turkey, or javelina (collared peccary) during an
 open archery season provided by law or by the proclamations of the
 commission and during which season only crossbows, [used by hunters
 with upper limb disabilities and] longbows, recurved bows, and
 compound bows may be used unless the person has acquired an archery
 hunting stamp issued to the person by the department. The
 commission by rule may prescribe requirements relating to
 possessing a stamp required by this subchapter. In a county that
 does not permit hunting with a firearm, a hunter may use a crossbow
 only if the hunter is a person with upper limb disabilities and has
 an archery hunting stamp.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 proceeding regarding hunting with a crossbow that is pending or
 filed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *