Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR109 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.C.R. No. 109


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Family and friends of Joe Bob Stone of Paris, Texas,
 were greatly saddened by his passing on February 2, 2009, at the age
 of 92; and
 WHEREAS, Born on December 17, 1916, in Biardstown, to Tom and
 Beulah Harris Stone, "Fess" Stone grew up with the companionship of
 four brothers and three sisters; and
 WHEREAS, He graduated from Paris High School and East Texas
 State Teachers College and built a notable career in education;
 over the course of 44 years, Mr. Stone taught math and coached
 basketball in Powderly and at other schools in the area and took on
 the added responsibility of driving a school bus; and
 WHEREAS, In 1948, he was joined in marriage to the former
 Alleen Morrison, and the couple shared a fulfilling relationship
 that was further enriched by the addition of two children; through
 the years, Mr. Stone took great pleasure in welcoming five
 grandchildren, nine great-grandchildren, and seven
 great-great-grandchildren into his family; and
 WHEREAS, A valued congregant of East Paris Baptist Church,
 Fess Stone lived a rewarding life of service to his family and his
 community, and he will forever hold a treasured place in the hearts
 of those who knew and loved him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Joe Bob Stone and extend sincere
 sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife of 60 years,
 Alleen Stone; to his son, Jimmy Stone, and his wife, Jan; to his
 daughter, Norma Upchurch, and her husband, Wayne; to his
 grandchildren and their spouses, Clint and Anna Upchurch, Randy and
 Marsha Upchurch, Dale and Michelle Upchurch, Lisa and Neal Coleman,
 and Joe Robert Stone; to his nine great-grandchildren and seven
 great-great-grandchildren; and to his other relatives and friends;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Joe Bob Stone.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 109 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 26, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 109 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor