Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR168 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R21175 CBE-D
 By: Anderson, Miller of Erath, Button, H.C.R. No. 168
 Branch, Hartnett, et al.


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, George W. Bush was the first Texas governor to
 become president of the United States, and as he takes up residence
 once again in the Lone Star State, it is indeed a pleasure to
 welcome him home; and
 WHEREAS, The eldest child of former president George Herbert
 Walker Bush and former first lady Barbara Bush, George W. Bush was
 born in New Haven, Connecticut, on July 6, 1946; he grew up in
 Midland and Houston and went on to earn a bachelor's degree in
 history from Yale University and a master of business
 administration degree from the Harvard School of Business; after
 returning to Midland to enter the energy industry, he met Laura
 Welch, who became his wife on November 5, 1977; three years later,
 the couple were blessed with twin daughters, Jenna and Barbara; and
 WHEREAS, This dynamic Texan continued his career in energy
 until his father's successful 1988 presidential campaign, on which
 he served as a senior advisor, and he later assembled a group of
 investors to purchase the Texas Rangers baseball franchise; in
 1994, he began his own career in public service with his election as
 governor; during his six years in office, he fostered an atmosphere
 of bipartisanship and gained a reputation as a compassionate
 conservative who based public policy on a philosophy of limited
 government, personal responsibility, local control, and strong
 families; and
 WHEREAS, Having earned nationwide attention, the popular
 governor of Texas was urged to run for higher office, and on January
 20, 2001, he became the 43rd president of the United States, making
 history as the first son of a former president to win the White
 House since John Quincy Adams; President Bush was tested less than
 nine months after his inauguration by the terrible events of
 September 11, 2001, and the swiftness and determination of his
 response would define his presidency; and
 WHEREAS, In his address to the nation that night, President
 Bush condemned the acts of terror and uplifted the American people
 with assurances of safety and justice; he subsequently proclaimed
 September 14, 2001, as a National Day of Prayer and Remembrance, and
 on that day he stood amid rescue workers in the rubble of the World
 Trade Center and again offered words of comfort to the grieving
 nation; and
 WHEREAS, Throughout the remainder of his first term and
 continuing through his second, President Bush made national
 security his highest priority; he created the Department of
 Homeland Security and transformed the military, the intelligence
 community, and the FBI; and
 WHEREAS, The Bush administration met numerous foreign policy
 challenges, while also making constructive progress in relations
 with India and sustaining a solid relationship with China;
 President Bush persuaded Libya to abandon its advanced missile
 programs, leading to normalized relations; in Africa, he vastly
 increased development assistance, and he has won high praise for
 his support of global initiatives to combat AIDS, malaria, and
 tuberculosis; and
 WHEREAS, By pushing through a prescription drug benefit,
 President Bush helped millions of older Americans, and today more
 than 25 million people are enrolled in Medicare drug plans
 administered by private insurers; in addition, he expanded access
 to health care by doubling direct federal financing for community
 health centers; he also worked with Congress to enact the No Child
 Left Behind Act, an ambitious template for educational reform; and
 WHEREAS, For the past eight years, President George W. Bush
 lived each day with the safety and prosperity of his fellow citizens
 foremost in his mind; he took a principled stance on a wide range of
 issues of great importance to every American, and his tireless
 efforts will not soon be forgotten; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby welcome former president George W. Bush back to the Lone Star
 State and extend to him sincere appreciation for his service to our
 state and nation; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for former president Bush as an expression of high regard
 by the Texas House of Representatives and Senate.