Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR174 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Swinford (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.C.R. No. 174
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 30, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 13, 2009, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 13, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.C.R. No. 174 By: Huffman


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The Honorable George E. "Buddy" West of Odessa, a
 highly respected member of the Texas House of Representatives,
 passed away on June 25, 2008, at the age of 71; and
 WHEREAS, Over the course of his notable tenure, which spanned
 from 1992 until his death, Representative West served constituents
 in Ector, Andrews, and Winkler Counties, earning the appreciation
 and admiration of countless people along the way; he was
 particularly active in the areas of energy policy and education,
 chairing the House Committee on Energy Resources, contributing to
 committees on public education and higher education, and supporting
 the growth of his alma mater, The University of Texas of the Permian
 Basin; moreover, he was always a strong advocate for Odessa, the
 city he called home for more than 60 years; and
 WHEREAS, The Texas Legislature has a long history of honoring
 groups and individuals by designating highways, roads, bridges, and
 other infrastructure in their honor, and Buddy West's exemplary
 contributions to the Lone Star State make him especially worthy of
 such a tribute; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby request the Texas Department of Transportation to designate
 the overpass at the intersection of Highway 20 and Highway 338 in
 Odessa as the Buddy West Memorial Overpass; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That, subject to Section 225.021(c), Transportation
 Code, the department design and construct memorial markers indicating
 the designation of the overpass as the Buddy West Memorial Overpass
 and any other appropriate information and erect a marker at each end
 of the overpass; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the secretary of state forward an official
 copy of this resolution to the chair of the Texas Transportation
 Commission and the executive director of the Texas Department of
 Transportation.
 * * * * *