Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR191 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.C.R. No. 191


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, A full and productive life drew to a close with the
 passing of educator William S. Long of Hopkins County on April 6,
 2009, at the age of 96; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Samuel and Edith Long, "Pete" Long was
 born in Addran on January 25, 1913, and was a lifelong Hopkins
 County resident; after graduating from Sulphur Springs High School,
 he earned his bachelor's and master's degrees from East Texas State
 Teachers College in Commerce and began his career as the only
 instructor at a school in Macedonia; on June 1, 1935, he married the
 former Evelyn "Eva" Ruth Chapman, a fellow educator, and they later
 became the parents of four children; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Long taught in Addran and Birthright and was
 instrumental in the consolidation of their schools in the North
 Hopkins Independent School District in the early 1940s; in
 addition, he taught aviation electronics as a civilian instructor
 at Sheppard Field during World War II; he served North Hopkins ISD
 as a teacher, coach, and principal before becoming superintendent,
 a position he held for 35 years; to the faculty and staff, he and his
 wife were "Mr. Pete" and "Miss Ruth", and the couple fostered a
 family atmosphere, organizing monthly restaurant outings and
 hosting Christmas parties at their home; and
 WHEREAS, A caring mentor and exemplary role model, Mr. Long
 encouraged participation in athletics, agriculture, and other
 activities, even chauffeuring students to basketball games and to
 livestock shows as far away as Houston; he won the lasting respect
 and admiration of his students, who continued to pay visits to the
 Longs at their home after they had retired; their son, Tommy, became
 district superintendent in 1988; and
 WHEREAS, In his retirement, Pete Long remained an
 enthusiastic fan of the North Hopkins Panthers and supported them
 with regular attendance at ball games; he was also a farmer and
 cattle rancher, and he and Mrs. Long enjoyed traveling together
 with friends and family until her death in 1999; and
 WHEREAS, This dedicated professional held lifetime
 memberships in the Parent-Teacher Association, the Texas State
 Teachers Association, the Texas Retired Teachers Association, and
 the Texas Association of School Administrators, and he served on
 the boards of the Hopkins County Civic Center and the Region VIII
 Service Center; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Long was also an active member of his community,
 serving as chair of Sulphur Springs/Hopkins County Crime Stoppers
 and as a charter member of the local chapter of Golden K Kiwanis;
 among other civic contributions, he participated in the Rural Urban
 Organization, which named him Outstanding Citizen in 1986; his
 numerous other accolades included recognition as an Outstanding
 Older Texan by Governor Bill Clements; moreover, for nearly 70
 years, he was a member of the Masonic Lodge in Sulphur Springs, and
 the Master Mason was also a valued member of North Hopkins Baptist
 Church, where he was a deacon and longtime Sunday school teacher;
 and
 WHEREAS, Pete Long left a lasting imprint on countless lives
 through his commitment to education and to his community, and
 memories of this beloved Texan will forever be treasured by all
 those who were fortunate enough to know him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of William S. Long and extend deepest
 sympathy to the members of his family: to his sons, William Long and
 his wife, Georgie, Tommy Long and his wife, Carolyn, and Frank Long
 and his wife, Juli; to his daughter, Sammie Bedford; to his
 grandchildren, Julie, William, Kristin, John, Reid, Ami, and Sam
 Long, Shawn Brewer and his wife, Lauri, and Brian Brewer and his
 wife, Jeannie; to his great-grandchildren, Cara, Colton, Clay,
 Austin, Autumn, Kate, and Emma; to his sister, Margaret Glosup; to
 his sisters-in-law, Edna Grant and Agnes Chapman; to his
 brother-in-law, Harve Chapman, and his wife, Martha Kate; and to
 his other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Pete Long.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 191 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 30, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 191 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 18, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor