Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR34 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R5785 MMS-F
 By: Berman H.C.R. No. 34


 CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, United States Border Patrol Agents Ignacio Ramos and
 Jose Compean worked on the United States border with Mexico; and
 WHEREAS, David Aguilar, the chief of the Office of Border
 Patrol, testified before the United States Senate that "Border
 violence incidents are perpetrated against our agents on an all too
 frequent basis . . . from February 1, 2005, through June 30, 2007,
 there have been 1,982 incidents where border patrol agents have
 been assaulted. These assaults include rockings, physical
 assaults, vehicular assaults, as well as shootings and assaults
 with other weapons. . . . Border patrol agents have responded with
 the use of deadly force on 116 occasions, with 144 agents
 discharging their weapons during these 116 incidents"; and
 WHEREAS, This information would support the premise that
 border patrol agents operate in a climate of tension, danger, and
 even fear for the safety of themselves and others; and
 WHEREAS, On February 17, 2005, near Fabens, Texas, Agents
 Ramos and Compean, along with other border patrol agents, were
 involved in the pursuit of Osvaldo Aldrete-Davila, a Mexican
 national they suspected of smuggling drugs; and
 WHEREAS, After a high speed vehicle chase, Aldrete-Davila
 abandoned the van he was driving on the United States side of the
 border and fled on foot toward the border with Mexico; and
 WHEREAS, Agents Ramos and Compean also exited their
 respective vehicles and continued the pursuit on foot, with Agent
 Compean attempting to intercept Aldrete-Davila while Agent Ramos
 chased Aldrete-Davila directly; and
 WHEREAS, During the incident, both Agents Ramos and Compean
 discharged their weapons, and Agent Ramos testified later that he
 believed Aldrete-Davila had a gun in his hand, while Agent Compean
 testified that he saw something "shiny" in Aldrete-Davila's hand,
 but no weapon was recovered; and
 WHEREAS, According to forensic evidence, Aldrete-Davila was
 struck by a bullet from the gun of Agent Ramos, but both agents
 later testified that they did not realize at the time that he had
 been hit; and
 WHEREAS, Aldrete-Davila fled across the border into Mexico;
 the van driven by Aldrete-Davila was discovered by other border
 patrol agents to contain 743 pounds of marijuana, worth
 approximately $1 million; and
 WHEREAS, Following an investigation by the United States
 Department of Homeland Security's Inspector General and the office
 of the United States Attorney for the Western District of Texas,
 Agents Ramos and Compean were arrested approximately one month
 after the incident; and
 WHEREAS, Serious questions have been raised about the manner
 in which the office of United States Attorney Johnny Sutton
 prosecuted the agents, basing his cases largely on the testimony of
 Aldrete-Davila, testimony for which he was granted "limited use
 immunity" by United States Attorney Sutton's office; and
 WHEREAS, Aldrete-Davila was not required to fully honor his
 immunity agreement and testify about his alleged involvement in
 drug trafficking after the events of February 17, 2005, and before
 the trial of Agents Ramos and Compean began; and
 WHEREAS, Aldrete-Davila was arrested in the United States on
 November 15, 2007, and charged with conspiracy to possess marijuana
 between June 1, 2005, and November 30, 2005, and also charged with
 smuggling approximately 750 pounds of marijuana, worth over $1
 million, in October 2005, during the period he possessed "limited
 use immunity" for his testimony against Agents Ramos and Compean;
 and
 WHEREAS, Among other charges, Border Patrol Agents Ramos and
 Compean were charged by the United States Attorney's office under
 Section 924(c), Title 18, United States Code, with "Discharge of a
 firearm in commission of a crime of violence," which carries a
 10-year mandatory minimum sentence; and
 WHEREAS, Agents Ramos and Compean admitted that they did not
 fully adhere to border patrol policies with regard to reporting the
 incident, an error that usually would have led to a written
 reprimand, suspension, or dismissal; and
 WHEREAS, Agents Ramos and Compean were found guilty of
 violating Section 924(c), Title 18, United States Code, and
 received the 10-year mandatory minimum sentence; and
 WHEREAS, Agents Ramos and Compean were also convicted on
 other charges, so that their total sentences amounted to 11- and
 12-year terms, respectively; and
 WHEREAS, According to the United States Sentencing
 Commission, the average sentences in federal cases of sexual abuse
 averaged 8-1/3 years in 2006, the last year for which data is
 available; and
 WHEREAS, According to the United States Sentencing
 Commission, sentences in federal cases for manslaughter averaged
 just less than four years in 2006; and
 WHEREAS, According to the United States Sentencing
 Commission, the average sentences in federal cases of assault
 averaged just less than three years in 2006; and
 WHEREAS, According to the United States Sentencing
 Commission, sentences in federal cases involving firearms charges
 averaged three years in 2006; and
 WHEREAS, The sentences imposed on Agents Ramos and Compean
 are profoundly disproportionate based on the totality of
 circumstances and sentencing guidelines; and
 WHEREAS, These disproportionate sentences constitute a
 miscarriage of justice; and
 WHEREAS, Former Deputy Chief Luis Barker, who headed the
 border patrol office in the El Paso sector at the time of the
 incident, stated before the United States Senate that he agreed the
 penalty received by Agents Ramos and Compean was disproportionate;
 and
 WHEREAS, United States Attorney Sutton, referring to the
 sentences received by Agents Ramos and Compean, said, "Some say
 it's just too much time, and I have some sympathy for that"; and
 WHEREAS, Aldrete-Davila was reported in a press account to
 have stated that he thought the sentences were excessive; and
 WHEREAS, Agents Ramos's and Compean's motions to remain free
 on bond while they appeal their sentences were denied; and
 WHEREAS, Agents Ramos and Compean have been imprisoned since
 January 17, 2007, and had their sentences commuted by the president
 of the United States on January 19, 2009; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby respectfully request that the president of the United States
 immediately grant a full pardon to both agents, with restoration of
 pay and benefits; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the Texas secretary of state forward an
 official copy of this resolution to the president of the United
 States of America.