H.J.R. No. 127 A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing a constitutional amendment to allow an officer or enlisted member of the Texas State Guard or other state militia or military force to hold other civil offices. BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 40(a), Article XVI, Texas Constitution, is amended to read as follows: (a) No person shall hold or exercise at the same time, more than one civil office of emolument, except that of Justice of the Peace, County Commissioner, Notary Public and Postmaster, Officer of the National Guard, the National Guard Reserve, and the Officers Reserve Corps of the United States and enlisted men of the National Guard, the National Guard Reserve, and the Organized Reserves of the United States, and retired officers of the United States Army, Air Force, Navy, Marine Corps, and Coast Guard, and retired warrant officers, and retired enlisted men of the United States Army, Air Force, Navy, Marine Corps, and Coast Guard, and officers and enlisted members of the Texas State Guard and any other active militia or military force organized under state law, and the officers and directors of soil and water conservation districts, unless otherwise specially provided herein. Provided, that nothing in this Constitution shall be construed to prohibit an officer or enlisted man of the National Guard, [and] the National Guard Reserve, the Texas State Guard, and any other active militia or military force organized under state law, or an officer in the Officers Reserve Corps of the United States, or an enlisted man in the Organized Reserves of the United States, or retired officers of the United States Army, Air Force, Navy, Marine Corps, and Coast Guard, and retired warrant officers, and retired enlisted men of the United States Army, Air Force, Navy, Marine Corps, and Coast Guard, and officers of the State soil and water conservation districts, from holding at the same time any other office or position of honor, trust or profit, under this State or the United States, or from voting at any election, general, special or primary in this State when otherwise qualified. SECTION 2. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2009. The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the proposition: "The constitutional amendment to allow an officer or enlisted member of the Texas State Guard or other state militia or military force to hold other civil offices." ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.J.R. No. 127 was passed by the House on May 11, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.J.R. No. 127 on May 29, 2009, by a non-record vote; and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.J.R. No. 127 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.J.R. No. 127 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.J.R. No. 127 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate RECEIVED: __________________ Date __________________ Secretary of State