Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HJR132 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Corte, King of Taylor H.J.R. No. 132
 (Senate Sponsor - Wentworth)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2009;
 May 13, 2009, read first time and referred to Subcommittee on Base
 Realignment and Closure; May 23, 2009, reported favorably from
 Committee on Veteran Affairs and Military Installations by the
 following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment relating to the financing,
 including through tax increment financing, of the acquisition by
 municipalities and counties of buffer areas or open spaces adjacent
 to a military installation for certain purposes.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article III, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 52k to read as follows:
 Sec. 52k.  The legislature by general law may authorize a
 municipality or county to issue bonds or notes to finance the
 acquisition of buffer areas or open spaces adjacent to a military
 installation for the prevention of encroachment or for the
 construction of roadways, utilities, or other infrastructure to
 protect or promote the mission of the military installation. The
 municipality or county may pledge increases in ad valorem tax
 revenues imposed in the area by the municipality, county, or other
 political subdivisions for repayment of the bonds or notes.
 SECTION 2. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2009.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the
 financing, including through tax increment financing, of the
 acquisition by municipalities and counties of buffer areas or open
 spaces adjacent to a military installation for the prevention of
 encroachment or for the construction of roadways, utilities, or
 other infrastructure to protect or promote the mission of the
 military installation."
 * * * * *