Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HJR14 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Corte, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Duncan) H.J.R. No. 14
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2009;
 May 13, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.J.R. No. 14 By: Duncan


 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment to prohibit the taking of
 property for transfer to a private entity for certain purposes.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 17, Article I, Texas Constitution, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 17. (a) No person's property shall be taken, damaged
 or destroyed for or applied to public use without adequate
 compensation being made, unless by the consent of such person; and,
 when taken, except for the use of the State, such compensation shall
 be first made, or secured by a deposit of money; and no irrevocable
 or uncontrollable grant of special privileges or immunities, shall
 be made; but all privileges and franchises granted by the
 Legislature, or created under its authority shall be subject to the
 control thereof.
 (b)  In this section, "public use" does not include the
 taking of property by the State or a political subdivision of the
 State for transfer to a private entity for the primary purpose of
 economic development or enhancement of tax revenues.
 SECTION 2. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2009.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment to prohibit the taking
 of property for transfer to a private entity for the primary purpose
 of economic development or enhancement of tax revenues."
 * * * * *