Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HJR54 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 16, 2009      TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HJR54 by Deshotel (Proposing a constitutional amendment to limit the purposes for which revenues from motor vehicle registration fees, taxes on motor fuels and lubricants, and certain revenues received from the federal government may be used.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HJR54, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($90,882) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 16, 2009





  TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HJR54 by Deshotel (Proposing a constitutional amendment to limit the purposes for which revenues from motor vehicle registration fees, taxes on motor fuels and lubricants, and certain revenues received from the federal government may be used.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HJR54 by Deshotel (Proposing a constitutional amendment to limit the purposes for which revenues from motor vehicle registration fees, taxes on motor fuels and lubricants, and certain revenues received from the federal government may be used.), As Introduced

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation 

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HJR54 by Deshotel (Proposing a constitutional amendment to limit the purposes for which revenues from motor vehicle registration fees, taxes on motor fuels and lubricants, and certain revenues received from the federal government may be used.), As Introduced

HJR54 by Deshotel (Proposing a constitutional amendment to limit the purposes for which revenues from motor vehicle registration fees, taxes on motor fuels and lubricants, and certain revenues received from the federal government may be used.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HJR54, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($90,882) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HJR54, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($90,882) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 ($90,882)   2011 $0   2012 ($625,011,935)   2013 ($625,011,935)   2014 ($625,011,935)    


2010 ($90,882)
2011 $0
2012 ($625,011,935)
2013 ($625,011,935)
2014 ($625,011,935)

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2010 ($90,882)   2011 $0   2012 ($625,011,935)   2013 ($625,011,935)   2014 ($625,011,935)   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2010 ($90,882)   2011 $0   2012 ($625,011,935)   2013 ($625,011,935)   2014 ($625,011,935)  


2010 ($90,882)
2011 $0
2012 ($625,011,935)
2013 ($625,011,935)
2014 ($625,011,935)

Fiscal Analysis

The resolution would amend Article VIII, Sections 7-a and 7-b to propose a constitutional amendment to remove policing public roadways from the constitutionally-dedicated uses of motor fuel tax, motor lubricant sales tax, and vehicle registration fees, and certain revenues received from the federal government.  The proposed amendment would be submitted to voters at an election to be held November 3, 2009. If adopted, the provisions would be effective on September 1, 2011. The cost to the state for the publication of the resolution is $90,882 in fiscal year 2010.

The resolution would amend Article VIII, Sections 7-a and 7-b to propose a constitutional amendment to remove policing public roadways from the constitutionally-dedicated uses of motor fuel tax, motor lubricant sales tax, and vehicle registration fees, and certain revenues received from the federal government. 

The proposed amendment would be submitted to voters at an election to be held November 3, 2009. If adopted, the provisions would be effective on September 1, 2011. The cost to the state for the publication of the resolution is $90,882 in fiscal year 2010.

Methodology

The Department of Public Safety's (DPS) State Highway Fund 6 appropriations (including employee benefits) total $625,011,935 in fiscal year 2009, which is 76 percent of the agency's total appropriations. The resolution states that upon voter approval, the provisions would take effect on September 1, 2011, which would be the beginning of state fiscal year 2012. This resolution would allow DPS to use Fund 6 in fiscal years 2010 and 2011, but the agency would not be able to access these funds beginning in fiscal year 2012. This analysis assumes that General Revenue Funds would be used to fund DPS at fiscal year 2009 funding levels for fiscal years 2012 and beyond. 

The Department of Public Safety's (DPS) State Highway Fund 6 appropriations (including employee benefits) total $625,011,935 in fiscal year 2009, which is 76 percent of the agency's total appropriations. The resolution states that upon voter approval, the provisions would take effect on September 1, 2011, which would be the beginning of state fiscal year 2012. This resolution would allow DPS to use Fund 6 in fiscal years 2010 and 2011, but the agency would not be able to access these funds beginning in fiscal year 2012. This analysis assumes that General Revenue Funds would be used to fund DPS at fiscal year 2009 funding levels for fiscal years 2012 and beyond. 

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 405 Department of Public Safety, 601 Department of Transportation

405 Department of Public Safety, 601 Department of Transportation

LBB Staff: JOB, KJG, GG, LG, TG

 JOB, KJG, GG, LG, TG