Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HJR7 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Flores, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.J.R. No. 7
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 14, 2009;
 May 15, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 21, 2009, reported
 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 3, Nays 0; May 21, 2009,
 sent to printer.)


 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment to require partnering with the
 United States Department of Veterans Affairs and other federal
 agencies to establish a veterans hospital in the Rio Grande Valley
 region of the state.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article XVI, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 73 to read as follows:
 Sec. 73.  (a)  The Texas Veterans Commission and the
 Department of State Health Services shall work with the United
 States Department of Veterans Affairs and any other appropriate
 federal agency to propose that the federal government establish a
 veterans hospital in the Rio Grande Valley region of the state.
 (b)  The state may contribute money, property, and other
 resources to the establishment, maintenance, and operation of a
 veterans hospital described by this section.
 SECTION 2. The constitutional amendment proposed by this
 resolution shall be submitted to the voters at an election to be
 held November 3, 2009. The ballot shall be printed to permit voting
 for or against the proposition: "The constitutional amendment to
 require partnering with the United States Department of Veterans
 Affairs and other federal agencies to establish a veterans hospital
 in the Rio Grande Valley region of the state."
 * * * * *