81R22620 BGU-D By: Vaught H.R. No. 1591 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, Between the surrender of Japan on September 2, 1945, and the dissolution of the Soviet Union on December 25-26, 1991, the world witnessed a period of military, economic, and ideological confrontation known as the Cold War; and WHEREAS, Although the Cold War never erupted into a full-scale armed conflict between the world's superpowers, it gave impetus to a number of localized hot wars, as well as to a massive military buildup on the part of both the United States and the Soviet Union; the consequent demands on U.S. military personnel were often arduous and dangerous; and WHEREAS, In the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2002, Congress authorized the U.S. Department of Defense to issue a Cold War Service Medal, to be given to each member of the U.S. military who served satisfactorily on active duty during the Cold War era; the DOD has refused, however, to create such an award; instead, since 1999, the department has made available a Cold War Recognition Certificate, to be given to those who served during the Cold War either as a member of the armed forces or as a federal employee; and WHEREAS, Cold War veterans believe that this certificate scarcely suffices to recognize the sacrifices they bore or the service they rendered; since the certificate was first offered, the American Legion, VFW, Reserve Officers Association, Combat Infantrymen's Association, Cold War Veterans Association, and AMVETS have all expressed the desire that service in the Cold War be honored with an official medal; and WHEREAS, A medal that honors service similar to that of Cold War veterans already exists and, if made available to those veterans, would both pay them the tribute they are owed and resolve the Pentagon's concern about the cost of issuing a new award; the American Defense Service Medal, created by Executive Order 8808, is given to service personnel who served between September 8, 1939, following the outbreak of war in Europe, and December 7, 1941, when Japan bombed Pearl Harbor; as during the Cold War, the U.S. military spent this period bracing for armed hostilities; and WHEREAS, A precedent for expanding the dates of eligibility for the American Defense Service Medal exists with the National Defense Service Medal; initially awarded for service during the period of the Korean War, the NDSM was subsequently awarded for service during the period of the Vietnam War, Desert Shield/Desert Storm, and the Global War on Terror; and WHEREAS, The heraldry, order of precedence, and related issues pertaining to the American Defense Service Medal have already been settled; the only change in the medal that would be required would be the removal of the original dates of eligibility, which are presently engraved on the reverse; removing these dates will also facilitate the reopening of this award for service during a similar period of emergency in the future; and WHEREAS, There is little doubt that Cold War veterans will prefer to purchase the American Defense Service Medal as opposed to unofficial commemorative medals, which are not authorized to be worn on uniforms, thus significantly reducing the cost to the defense department for providing this award; and WHEREAS, Those who served in the United States Army, Navy, Marines, Air Force, and Coast Guard during the years of the Cold War made an immeasurable contribution to the safety of this country and its allies, and they are indeed deserving of appropriate recognition; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas Legislature hereby respectfully urge the president of the United States to modify Executive Order 8808 so as to award the American Defense Service Medal to United States armed forces personnel who served on active duty in the period after September 1, 1945, and before December 27, 1991; and, be it further RESOLVED, That the chief clerk of the house forward an official copy of this resolution to the president of the United States.