Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR1591 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 1591


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Between the surrender of Japan on September 2, 1945,
 and the dissolution of the Soviet Union on December 25-26, 1991, the
 world witnessed a period of military, economic, and ideological
 confrontation known as the Cold War; and
 WHEREAS, Although the Cold War never erupted into a
 full-scale armed conflict between the world's superpowers, it gave
 impetus to a number of localized hot wars, as well as to a massive
 military buildup on the part of both the United States and the
 Soviet Union; the consequent demands on U.S. military personnel
 were often arduous and dangerous; and
 WHEREAS, In the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal
 Year 2002, Congress authorized the U.S. Department of Defense to
 issue a Cold War Service Medal, to be given to each member of the
 U.S. military who served satisfactorily on active duty during the
 Cold War era; the DOD has refused, however, to create such an award;
 instead, since 1999, the department has made available a Cold War
 Recognition Certificate, to be given to those who served during the
 Cold War either as a member of the armed forces or as a federal
 employee; and
 WHEREAS, Cold War veterans believe that this certificate
 scarcely suffices to recognize the sacrifices they bore or the
 service they rendered; since the certificate was first offered, the
 American Legion, VFW, Reserve Officers Association, Combat
 Infantrymen's Association, Cold War Veterans Association, and
 AMVETS have all expressed the desire that service in the Cold War be
 honored with an official medal; and
 WHEREAS, A medal that honors service similar to that of Cold
 War veterans already exists and, if made available to those
 veterans, would both pay them the tribute they are owed and resolve
 the Pentagon's concern about the cost of issuing a new award; the
 American Defense Service Medal, created by Executive Order 8808, is
 given to service personnel who served between September 8, 1939,
 following the outbreak of war in Europe, and December 7, 1941, when
 Japan bombed Pearl Harbor; as during the Cold War, the U.S. military
 spent this period bracing for armed hostilities; and
 WHEREAS, A precedent for expanding the dates of eligibility
 for the American Defense Service Medal exists with the National
 Defense Service Medal; initially awarded for service during the
 period of the Korean War, the NDSM was subsequently awarded for
 service during the period of the Vietnam War, Desert Shield/Desert
 Storm, and the Global War on Terror; and
 WHEREAS, The heraldry, order of precedence, and related
 issues pertaining to the American Defense Service Medal have
 already been settled; the only change in the medal that would be
 required would be the removal of the original dates of eligibility,
 which are presently engraved on the reverse; removing these dates
 will also facilitate the reopening of this award for service during
 a similar period of emergency in the future; and
 WHEREAS, There is little doubt that Cold War veterans will
 prefer to purchase the American Defense Service Medal as opposed to
 unofficial commemorative medals, which are not authorized to be
 worn on uniforms, thus significantly reducing the cost to the
 defense department for providing this award; and
 WHEREAS, Those who served in the United States Army, Navy,
 Marines, Air Force, and Coast Guard during the years of the Cold War
 made an immeasurable contribution to the safety of this country and
 its allies, and they are indeed deserving of appropriate
 recognition; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby respectfully urge the president of the United
 States to modify Executive Order 8808 so as to award the American
 Defense Service Medal to United States armed forces personnel who
 served on active duty in the period after September 1, 1945, and
 before December 27, 1991; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the chief clerk of the house forward an
 official copy of this resolution to the president of the United
 States.
 Vaught
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1591 was adopted by the House on May
 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House