Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR1613 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R23848 MMS-D
 By: Geren H.R. No. 1613


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Ronald Ray Hughes is retiring from House Business
 Operations on April 30, 2009, after 26 years of exemplary service in
 behalf of the State of Texas; and
 WHEREAS, Born on November 30, 1947, in Dothan, Alabama, Mr.
 Hughes graduated from high school in nearby Ashford in 1966; he then
 worked for two years in Florida before moving to Lufkin, where on
 March 25, 1969, he married Mona Wythe; Ron Hughes and his wife
 subsequently became the proud parents of three children, Donovan
 Duane, Dawn Denise, and Emily Jo; and
 WHEREAS, In May 1969, Mr. Hughes was inducted into the United
 States Army; chosen as "Trainee of the Cycle" at the end of boot
 camp, he was subsequently selected for noncommissioned officer
 training and then appointed as an instructor for Advanced
 Individual Training; and
 WHEREAS, In April 1970, Ron Hughes shipped out to Vietnam
 with the rank of platoon sergeant, assigned to Company C, 2nd
 Battalion, 12th Infantry Regiment, 25th Infantry Division; while
 engaged in a reconnaissance mission on July 31, 1970, his company
 came under intense attack from a large enemy force and he was
 seriously wounded; in spite of his injuries, he succeeded in moving
 forward under enemy fire to another American soldier who was also
 gravely wounded; placing suppressive fire on the adversaries, Ron
 Hughes was able to move the man to safety, an action for which he was
 awarded the Bronze Star; his other military awards include the
 Purple Heart and the Army Commendation Medal; and
 WHEREAS, The injuries that Mr. Hughes sustained in Vietnam
 resulted in a long period of rehabilitation; discharged from the
 army in 1971, he returned home to Lufkin and attended Angelina
 Junior College and later Stephen F. Austin State University; he
 settled in Austin in 1975; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hughes worked in the Sergeant's Office for the
 Texas House of Representatives from January to September 1981, when
 he accepted the post of assistant property manager in the House
 Property Office; promoted in 1985 to property manager, he worked in
 that capacity for six years; after a brief hiatus, he returned to
 state government in 1993 and has worked for the Purchasing and
 Supply Department of House Business Operations since that date; and
 WHEREAS, Ron Hughes has devoted more than a quarter-century
 to the Texas House of Representatives, and he can indeed take
 justifiable pride in his outstanding service to the Lone Star
 State; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby honor Ronald Ray Hughes on the occasion of his
 retirement from House Business Operations and extend to him sincere
 best wishes as he embarks on the next exciting chapter of his life;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for Mr. Hughes as an expression of high regard by the Texas
 House of Representatives.