Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR2879 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R37878 GCB-D
 By: Naishtat H.R. No. 2879


 R E S O L U T I O N
 BE IT RESOLVED by the House of Representatives of the State of
 Texas, 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, That House Rule 13,
 Section 9(a), be suspended in part as provided by House Rule 13,
 Section 9(f), to enable the conference committee appointed to
 resolve the differences on House Bill 3352 (the collection,
 dissemination, and correction of certain judicial determinations
 for a federal firearm background check) to consider and take action
 on the following matter:
 House Rule 13, Section 9(a)(3), is suspended to permit the
 committee to add text on a matter not in disagreement in proposed
 SECTION 3 of the bill so that it reads as follows:
 SECTION 3. (a) Each clerk of the court shall prepare and
 forward information for each order issued on or after the effective
 date of this Act to the Department of Public Safety as required by
 Section 411.0521, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 (b) Not later than September 1, 2010, a clerk of the court
 having records described by Section 411.052(a) or 411.0521,
 Government Code, as added by this Act, shall prepare and forward
 that information for any court orders issued on or after September
 1, 2004, and before September 1, 2009.
 (c) Not later than September 1, 2011, a clerk of the court
 having records described by Section 411.052(a) or 411.0521,
 Government Code, as added by this Act, shall prepare and forward
 that information for any court orders issued on or after September
 1, 1989, and before September 1, 2004.
 Explanation: This change is necessary to provide a clerk of
 court enough time to prepare and forward information required to be
 forwarded under this Act.